CONGOLESE AND CENTRAL AFRICA COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1110023
Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/05/2014 01/05/2015 01/05/2016 01/05/2017 01/05/2018
Total gross income £270 £100 £892 £101 £832
Total expenditure £261 £100 £888 £143 £830
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A