Financial history THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1108609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £111.03k £4.29m £5.82m £6.06m £5.35m
Total expenditure £185.79k £3.70m £4.13m £4.73m £4.17m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £282.89k £571.08k £624.66k £644.38k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £75.19k £68.12k £69.56k £68.21k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £3.81m £5.09m £5.28m £3.76m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £644.38k
Income - Investment N/A £109.54k £79.75k £79.76k £82.45k
Income - Other N/A £6.00k £3.55k £4.70k £788.79k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.05m £1.16m £1.29m £942.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £26.93k £15.71k £24.96k £24.24k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.50k £5.50k £5.60k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £2.62m £2.96m £3.41m £3.20m