FRIENDS OF HOPTON PTA

Charity number: 1108502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.27k £5.18k £5.14k £4.61k £128
Total expenditure £2.47k £1.32k £11.85k £1.64k £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A