SHREEBAI WELFARE FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1108754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 February 2018 393 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required