Financial history The Caring Family Foundation

Charity number: 1108870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £90.40k £28.18k £75.45k £1.93m £894.77k
Total expenditure £49.48k £140.84k £95.32k £2.29m £1.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.93m £891.55k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.22k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £2.29m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £51.27k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £18.50k £16.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £308.74k £409.83k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0