Financial history CROMWELL ACADEMY FRIENDS

Charity number: 1108935
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £5.63k £4.80k £694 £225 £182
Total expenditure £6.90k £2.01k £6.43k £111 £116
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A