Financial history Bernard Sunley Foundation

Charity number: 1109099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.04m £4.02m £4.20m £2.98m £2.64m
Total expenditure £3.65m £3.78m £4.46m £4.03m £4.50m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.04m £4.02m £4.20m £2.98m £2.64m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.18m £3.22m £3.80m £3.30m £3.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £470.00k £566.00k £653.00k £727.00k £796.00k
Expenditure - Governance £20.00k £25.00k £30.00k £35.00k £13.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.93m £2.95m £3.47m £2.97m £3.41m
Expenditure - Investment management £470.00k £566.00k £653.00k £727.00k £796.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0