Trustees TWODS LIMITED
Charity number: 1110254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUNE LYNN FULLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chloe Randall | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rachael Dunbar | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Emily Morrell | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Peter Ellis-Leagas | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ann Clow | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Swann | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jane Dellow | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
NINA EDWARDS | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jon Alcock | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE MORGAN | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.