COVO CONNECTING VOICES

Charity number: 1110832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £32.83k £23.50k £24.13k £23.26k £23.83k
Total expenditure £32.65k £29.29k £21.05k £22.44k £22.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £3.00k N/A N/A