THE LONDON IRISH RIFLES REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1120473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.26k £13.72k £14.77k £14.48k £11.28k
Total expenditure £23.81k £13.00k £20.02k £12.03k £4.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A