Accounts and annual returns SHEKINAH MINISTRIES THE GLORY CENTRE

Charity number: 1111414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 April 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 April 2024 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 April 2024 802 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2024 1167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1597 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1597 days