Accounts and annual returns World Church of Messiah UK
Charity number: 1114568
Charity reporting is up to date (134 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 December 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 20 December 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 December 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 20 December 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 December 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 December 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 14 November 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 14 November 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window