HOME-START BARNET

Charity number: 1109550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £405.73k £488.72k £492.28k £556.06k £504.61k
Total expenditure £385.54k £513.55k £477.54k £496.16k £559.58k
Income from government contracts £120.00k £139.95k £135.85k £104.38k £107.37k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £10.00k N/A £12.13k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £42.31k £36.63k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £335.15k £467.45k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £659 £529
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £177.94k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £495.06k £557.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.09k £1.96k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £428 £441
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0