Financial history FRIENDS OF ROCKLAND ST. MARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1109683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £3.86k £3.81k £2.31k £4.04k £17.56k
Total expenditure £3.39k £4.06k £961 £5.14k £17.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £351