OSCAR BIRMINGHAM LTD

Charity number: 1109849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £71.99k £62.34k £82.52k £88.66k £121.34k
Total expenditure £60.61k £54.63k £85.49k £89.32k £96.25k
Income from government contracts £29.59k £0 £26.71k £32.31k £27.91k
Income from government grants £4.66k £3.50k £26.71k N/A £21.33k