ST. THOMAS INDIAN (MALANKARA) ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1110650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £49.63k £58.40k £54.55k £61.51k £124.45k
Total expenditure £35.66k £43.21k £50.43k £36.90k £141.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A