Trustees NEW HALL SCHOOL TRUST
Charity number: 1110286

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Miriam Edelsten | Chair | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Olga Slater | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Yogi Adi Luxmi Sutton | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Richard Buxton | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Philip Wilson | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Janis Elizabeth Croom | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Agnes Therese Williams | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN FRANCIS ALDRIDGE | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
MALCOLM JOHN DAY | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
PAULINE MARIE WILSON | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
KATHERINE JEFFREY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.