Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S COLLEGE CROSBY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1110311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window