AL HASSAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115180
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 May 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 May 2020 109 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 March 2018 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 March 2018 44 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download