Governing document THE INCLUSION ZONE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 5 JULY 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND INDEPENDENCE OF PEOPLE WITH IMPAIRED MOBILITY IN THE YORKSHIRE AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE MOBILITY AIDS, SUCH AS ELECTRIC SCOOTERS AND POWERED AND MANUAL WHEELCHAIRS, TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL TO SHOPS AND OTHER PLACES OF INTEREST WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY, INDEPENDENCE AND QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.