Trustees LOWTHER GARDENS, LYTHAM

Charity number: 1117054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSAMUND GILLIAN FIELDEN Trustee 17 May 2024
None on record
LEONIE JANE GOVAN Trustee 19 April 2024
None on record
RONALD MATTHEWS Trustee 19 April 2024
None on record
DAVID JAMES CHAMBERS Trustee 15 March 2024
None on record
MARK WILLIAM FENTON Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Lyn Fenton Trustee 18 November 2022
None on record
WENDY ANNE SWIFT Trustee 15 December 2021
ROTARY CLUB OF BLACKPOOL PALATINE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
DAVID FREDERICK ROWE Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Susan Michelle Wood Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Teresa Anne Mallabone Trustee 28 August 2019
None on record
FYLDE BOROUGH COUNCIL Trustee
THE LYTHAM INSTITUTE
Received: On time