BEDFORD AFRICAN WOMEN FORUM

Charity number: 1110659
Charity reporting is overdue by 1699 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 04 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Annual return 04 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 969 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 969 days
Annual return 04 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1334 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1334 days
Annual return 04 June 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1699 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1699 days