Accounts and annual returns INDIAN QUEENS VICTORY HALL

Charity number: 1110642
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 July 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time