Financial history RUSHMOOR CONCERT BAND

Charity number: 1111990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £4.66k £4.85k £4.10k £3.99k £3.45k
Total expenditure £5.15k £5.86k £4.98k £4.01k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A