Financial history KICK4LIFE

Charity number: 1112133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £400.04k £198.82k £271.11k £250.03k £339.17k
Total expenditure £305.60k £242.64k £189.19k £223.20k £273.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A