Financial history SUPPORT SRI LANKA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1111896
Charity reporting is overdue by 1724 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £4.49k £246 £68 £7 £1.73k
Total expenditure £5.75k £350 £6.99k £1.01k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A