Financial history THE TERENCE MILLS TRUST

Charity number: 1111446
Charity reporting is overdue by 1581 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2009 01/10/2010 01/10/2011 01/10/2012 01/10/2013
Total gross income £1.80k £4.16k £4.65k £2.95k £1.72k
Total expenditure £2.23k £3.97k £4.47k £3.14k £1.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A