Trustees WELLINGTON AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1111155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Disney | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Symondson | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Gravestock | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Patricia Disney | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valsa De Winter | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sparkes | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Saunders | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Darts | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.