Trustees OBSTETRICS ANAESTHETISTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1111382
Charity reporting is up to date (121 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Carol Kenyon | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Amanda Grove | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rajveen Sodhi | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Archibald Broom | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shalini Cynthia Sundaram | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Wilkinson | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gemma Crossingham | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yavor Metodiev | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Armstrong | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nuala Lucas | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Katherine Griffiths | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Damien Hughes | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kirsty MacLennan | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr RACHEL ELINOR COLLIS | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Bamber | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.