Trustees YORK CARES
Charity number: 1111899
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Kew-Robson | Chair | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anne Margaret Soulsby | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jocelyn Clare Ivory | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Thompson | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Clarke | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mr Joe Micheli | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Draper | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROBERT FERGUSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.