Financial history A PLACE TO BE ME

Charity number: 1115083
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £24.49k £24.39k £23.98k £12.05k £7.79k
Total expenditure £34.90k £32.66k £33.91k £10.16k £7.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £990 N/A N/A N/A