Financial history ST ANN'S FAMILY AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112227
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.34k £7.46k £6.73k £5.61k £3.61k
Total expenditure £5.32k £9.30k £3.94k £5.40k £8.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A