MAYHEIGHTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1112291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.71m £7.78m £3.61m £2.92m £4.17m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.38m £1.51m £2.89m £2.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.54m £7.51m £2.99m £2.48m £3.47m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £269.74k £615.65k £442.60k £696.68k
Income - Other £175.28k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £1.38m £1.51m £2.87m £2.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.39k £0 £0 £15.85k £3.45k
Expenditure - Governance £4.89k £4.79k £5.62k £6.42k £7.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.47m £1.37m £1.50m £2.86m £2.21m
Expenditure - Investment management £650 £0 £0 £15.85k £3.45k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0