BERMUDA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.66k £38.98k £23.50k £167.35k £144.93k
Total expenditure £18.18k £38.12k £16.54k £168.11k £145.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £16.97k £2.12k £145.36k £127.57k