MEDIA STANDARDS TRUST

Charity number: 1113680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.01k £50 £77 £5.09k £5
Total expenditure £24.00k £1.38k £1.55k £11.08k £1.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A