Trustees ARDSLEY RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION CHARITY
Charity number: 1112373
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE VICTOR FELLOWS | Chair | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Matt Cawood | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Markey | Trustee | 14 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Langford | Trustee | 11 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE VERA BARNSLEY | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN FELLOWS | Trustee | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA WHAMOND | Trustee | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DAVID WHAMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.