Trustees NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE TRUST FUNDS
Charity number: 1111895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DEVLIN | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAURA BELSHAW | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
BECKY SUTTON | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELCOCK | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
IFTI MAJID | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SUNDERLAND | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GUIVER | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WYLD | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAN SENSIER | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
FIONA DANIEL | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL SMITH | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PADDY TIPPING | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MANJIT DARBY | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA NIXON | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN WHITE | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR ORMAN | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.