CAMDEN ABU DIS FRIENDSHIP ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £102.27k £124.46k £154.85k £69.68k £131.27k
Total expenditure £134.88k £137.99k £115.30k £96.63k £119.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A