BRADNET

Charity number: 1111920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.67m £1.20m £548.49k £489.37k £469.40k
Total expenditure £1.75m £1.13m £645.52k £609.44k £557.28k
Income from government contracts £1.57m £0 £520.69k N/A £457.91k
Income from government grants £103.14k £0 N/A £3.75k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £750 £1.03k £980 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £26.75k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.20m £520.69k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £80 £74 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £3.24k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.75m £1.13m £645.52k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £1.43k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A