Financial history EMMANUEL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (UK CITIES)

Charity number: 1112010
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £61.91k £27.42k £23.78k £22.27k £29.67k
Total expenditure £54.32k £29.83k £21.70k £26.09k £20.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A