Financial history THE D'OYLY CARTE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1112457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.57m £1.60m £1.66m £1.30m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.50m £1.59m £1.95m £2.08m £2.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.57m £1.60m £1.66m £1.30m £1.18m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.36m £1.72m £1.85m £1.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £248.47k £223.76k £228.63k £227.99k £247.88k
Expenditure - Governance £32.58k £33.87k £40.08k £36.37k £41.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.14m £1.25m £1.59m £1.72m £1.80m
Expenditure - Investment management £248.47k £223.76k £228.63k £227.99k £247.88k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0