THE TOPAZ TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1112338
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £4.36k £4.46k £4.84k £5.90k £9.31k
Total expenditure £9.22k £24.21k £10.51k £10.70k £14.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A