ENGLAND AND WALES CRICKET TRUST

Charity number: 1112540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 24 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 15 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 15 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 12 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 11 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 11 November 2016 On time Download