Financial history ENGLAND AND WALES CRICKET TRUST

Charity number: 1112540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £1.17m £22.00m £16.82m £27.37m £45.46m
Total expenditure £13.43m £18.03m £12.90m £19.75m £24.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £850.00k £800.00k £982.00k £796.13k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £21.00m £15.65m £26.41m £44.00m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £941.14k £895.00k £982.00k £796.13k £974.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £231.83k £97.79k £185.88k £111.80k £38.97k
Income - Other £0 £4.07k £0 £49.71k £450.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.42m £18.03m £12.89m £19.75m £23.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.48k £8.45k £8.34k £8.45k £27.22k
Expenditure - Governance £10.70k £10.53k £19.41k £91.71k £27.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £22.64m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £389.40k