LUMOS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dianne Moore Trustee 04 March 2016 None on record
Tanya Jeneme Motie Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
Carol Copland Trustee 15 September 2017 None on record
NEIL BLAIR Chair
THE ATLAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
GIVE IT FORWARD TODAY Received: On time
JW3 TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
DANIEL NICHOLAS COHEN Trustee 21 June 2013 None on record
Nitin Pasricha Trustee 08 April 2020
SUSSEX WILDLIFE TRUST Received: On time
CHICHESTER FESTIVAL THEATRE Received: On time
William DiMichele Trustee 14 July 2020 None on record
Neena Gill Trustee 20 April 2020 None on record
Dr Doreen Mulenga Trustee 06 October 2021 None on record