Accounts and annual returns MERSEYSIDE YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 May 2024 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 May 2024 691 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 May 2024 1056 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1476 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1476 days