Financial history FRIENDS OF ST FRANCIS DE SALES INFANT AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1112318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.02k £4.35k £5.64k £4.91k £0
Total expenditure £3.86k £4.33k £7.50k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A