ASSER BISHVIL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £7.39m £9.66m £8.90m £8.44m £8.35m
Total expenditure £7.43m £9.19m £8.63m £8.60m £8.36m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.35m £9.61m £8.83m £8.22m £8.12m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40.39k £45.28k £71.36k £219.80k £227.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.43m £9.19m £8.63m £8.60m £8.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.02k £6.72k £6.72k £8.10k £8.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.40m £9.16m £8.59m £8.56m £8.23m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0