ONLY CONNECT UK

Charity number: 1116147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/08/2016 30/08/2017 30/08/2018 30/08/2019 30/08/2020
Total gross income £1.02m £957.41k £710.64k £512.00k £734.00k
Total expenditure £1.13m £890.08k £727.04k £592.00k £495.00k
Income from government contracts £327.79k £563.80k N/A £164.20k £199.00k
Income from government grants £12.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £122.00k £393.60k £275.81k £12.00k £398.00k
Income - Other trading activities £16.05k £0 £172.64k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £886.95k £563.80k £262.20k £368.00k £326.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £132.00k £10.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £811.22k £673.88k £560.00k £470.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £93.00k £78.85k £53.17k £32.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £13.67k £9.36k £62.00k £43.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0