AZIZ WELFARE TRUST UK

Charity number: 1113053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £17.08k £10.44k £7.52k £20.92k £55.60k
Total expenditure £72.23k £106.50k £102.03k £70.79k £54.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A